MD HB469 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Board of Trustees of the Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans to make arrangements for the safe custody of investments with one or more duly qualified custodian banks or trust companies; and exempting certain agreements with managers and custodians of assets in certain investment elections authorized under the statements of investment policy adopted by the Board from certain provisions of the procurement law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback