MD HB47 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to revise no later than August 1, 2019, the Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards to repeal the requirements that a school-based health center have a medical director who is a physician and have a physician consultant who is available to discuss clinical issues as needed and to authorize a licensed physician or nurse practitioner to serve as a clinical director or clinical consultant of a school-based health center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Revision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed 47-0 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {856481/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-11HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback