MD HB471 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law requiring a therapeutically certified optometrist to refer a certain patient to an ophthalmologist under certain circumstances; repealing the authority of a therapeutically certified optometrist to prescribe certain topical therapeutic pharmaceutical agents and authorizing the prescription of therapeutic pharmaceutical agents for the prevention, management, or treatment of conditions and diseases of the eye and ocular adnexa; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {244637/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {956783/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0471&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0471f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0471t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0471e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_344_hb0471e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0471_95678301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0471_24463701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0471.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0471_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0568.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0471_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1034.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1223.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback