MD HB477 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "public safety officer" to include certain volunteer emergency medical technicians for purposes of a certain property tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-06HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback