MD HB48 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining an eSports competition as one involving video games, including first-person shooters, real-time strategy games, and certain multiplayer online battle arenas; authorizing an organization conducting an eSports competition to offer prize money or merchandise to winning participants in the competition; and authorizing the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations.
Title
eSports Act
Sponsors
Del. Robin Grammer [R] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] | Del. April Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {555666/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Comptroller
Gaming
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Comptroller
Gaming
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology