MD HB485 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1201
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1424
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board to review public-private partnership presolicitation reports and make certain recommendations; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for public-private partnerships with a total value that exceeds $500,000,000 presolicitation reports of certain contracts; requiring a reporting agency to submit a separate presolicitation report for each phase of a project that will develop in phases; etc.
Title
Public-Private Partnerships and the Collection of Video Tolls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-39) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {190514/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB485 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
SB361 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
SB361 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Contracts
COVID-19
Electronic Surveillance
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Fees
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privatization
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Video
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Contracts
COVID-19
Electronic Surveillance
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Fees
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privatization
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Solicitation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Time
Transportation
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |