MD HB488 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the discovery or perception of, or belief about, another person's race, color, national origin, sex, gender identity, or sexual orientation, whether or not accurate, does not constitute legally adequate provocation to mitigate a killing from the crime of murder to manslaughter or an assault from the crime of assault in the first degree to assault in the second degree or another lesser crime.
Title
Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {232514/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB488 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB554 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
SB554 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Assault
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Manslaughter
Murder
Sexual Orientation
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Manslaughter
Murder
Sexual Orientation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 2 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |