MD HB49 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the amounts on which a certain assessment is calculated for the purpose of recouping a certain health insurance provider fee are for insurance products that are subject to a certain provision of federal law and may be subject to an assessment by the State; requiring that the calculation of the assessment be made without regard to threshold limits established in a certain provision of the Affordable Care Act or the partial exclusion of net premiums provided for in a certain provision of the Affordable Care Act; etc.
Title
Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-13) (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-13) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |