MD HB497 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the owner of certain property repay all property taxes that would have been imposed if certain property tax credits had not been granted if the property ceases to be used for urban agricultural purposes; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 253 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |