MD HB5 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from placing or inscribing an item or a symbol, including an actual or depicted noose or swastika, whether temporary or permanent, on any real or personal property, public or private, without the express permission of the owner, owner's agent, or lawful occupant of the property, with the intent to threaten or intimidate any person or group of persons; and establishing that a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both applies to a violation of the Act.
Title
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-4) |
2020-01-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {942614/1 Adopted |
2020-01-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-10-11 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB161 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Harassment
Penalties and Sentences
Threats
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Harassment
Penalties and Sentences
Threats
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |