MD HB50 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Produce Safety Program in the Department of Agriculture to reduce the risk of adverse impacts on human health from the consumption of contaminated produce; requiring the Program to conform with certain federal standards for growing, harvesting, packing, and holding produce for human consumption; defining a "covered farm" as one which sold produce, over a 3-year period, with an average annual monetary value of $25,000; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer and enforce the Program; etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Counties
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Data
Disclosure
District Courts
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Food
Health
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Judges
Judgments
Juries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Libel and Slander
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Sunset
Trials
Warrants
Witnesses
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Counties
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Data
Disclosure
District Courts
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Food
Health
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Judges
Judgments
Juries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Libel and Slander
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Sunset
Trials
Warrants
Witnesses