MD HB501 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Imposing a certain fee on certain persons subject to the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission ethics laws for filing certain financial disclosure statements late; and setting the amount of a late fee at $5 for each day the filing is late, not to exceed a total of $500.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Ethics
Fees
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 19 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 19 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 19 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |