MD HB502 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Recycling within the Department of the Environment to provide to local communities certain encouragement, information, and examples relating to certain programs that divert mattresses and box springs from disposal in landfills and incinerators and that recycle or reuse mattresses and box springs; and requiring the Office, in coordination with the Maryland Environmental Service, to include in a certain report certain information relating to mattresses and box springs.
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Advertising
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Data
Disabilities
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Ex-Offenders
Indigent Persons
Notices
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Data
Disabilities
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Ex-Offenders
Indigent Persons
Notices
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth