MD HB503 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain employers are not liable, under certain circumstances, for negligently hiring or failing to adequately supervise an employee based on evidence that the employee has received probation before judgment for an offense or has been convicted of an offense; providing that the Act does not limit or abrogate certain other immunities or defenses; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsors
Del. Andrew Cassilly [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Steve Johnson [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Construction
Ex-Offenders
Industry and Technology
Liability
Negligence
Parole and Probation
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Storage
Work, Labor and Employment
Construction
Ex-Offenders
Industry and Technology
Liability
Negligence
Parole and Probation
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Storage
Work, Labor and Employment