MD HB503 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 224
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 224
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county superintendent of schools to allow a dependent child of a service member relocating to the State on military orders to enroll in a school in the county in accordance with certain provisions of law; requiring a county superintendent to allow a dependent child of a certain service member to apply for enrollment in a certain public school in the same manner and at the same time as individuals domiciled in the county; requiring the service member to provide certain documentation to the school by a certain time; etc.
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 224 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB391 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 225
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Age
Armed Forces
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Housing
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Public Schools
Records
Residency
Students
Time
Age
Armed Forces
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Housing
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Public Schools
Records
Residency
Students
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 115.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |