MD HB505 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by an individual who is at least 65 years old, has resided in the dwelling for 30 consecutive years, and whose combined income does not exceed $60,000; requiring the amount of the credit to equal 100% of any increase in the property tax imposed on the dwelling attributable to a property tax rate that exceeds $1.10 for each $100 of assessment; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 226 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {815066/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Elderly Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Elderly Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |