MD HB508 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain elements required to establish a defense to serving an alcoholic beverage to an underage individual; and providing that reliance by an establishment or a seller on the results of an electronic identification scanner that verifies the identity of an individual by certain technology fulfills an element of a certain defense.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Identification
Minors
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Identification
Minors
Telecommunications and Information Technology