MD HB510 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the owner or operator of a refuse disposal system from accepting loads of separately collected organic waste for final disposal unless the owner or operator provides for the organics recycling of the organic waste; authorizing that loads of separately collected food waste that are determined by an organics recycling facility to be unacceptable for recycling due to contamination may be accepted by a refuse disposal system for final disposal; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organic Waste – Organics Recycling – Collection and Acceptance for Final Disposal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366
2019-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {220513/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback