MD HB510 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Agriculture from certifying and registering a site that will be used to grow or cultivate hemp under the Hemp Research Pilot Program if the area on which the hemp will be grown is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences; and prohibiting the Department from issuing a license to a person to produce hemp in the State if the area on which the hemp will be produced is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences.
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB964 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Farmland
Licenses
Residential Property
Weights and Measures
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Farmland
Licenses
Residential Property
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 14 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 14 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0510?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0510f.pdf |