MD HB513 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the county boards of education in Caroline, Dorchester, Kent, Queen Anne's, and Talbot counties to establish a regional Career and Technology Education (CTE) school to provide career and technology education programs to public high school students in the counties; requiring a regional CTE school to operate under the terms of a certain collective bargaining agreement; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to study and develop a certain cost-share formula for certain county boards of education; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {985868/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback