MD HB513 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of Transportation to administer the Fund; requiring certain kidney dialysis centers to pay a certain fee for certain transports; establishing the Task Force to Study the Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund to review patient access to dialysis treatment and the direct costs incurred by counties for transporting dialysis patients to and from certain centers; etc.
Title
Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB695 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Ambulances
Auditors and Audits
Comptroller
Fees
Health
Health Care Facilities
Investments
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Auditors and Audits
Comptroller
Fees
Health
Health Care Facilities
Investments
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |