MD HB515 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a municipality to designate a qualified building inspector or enforcement officer to testify in a municipal infraction proceeding without the assistance of a prosecuting attorney; providing that a prosecuting attorney is not limited in or restricted from calling individuals to testify in a municipal infraction proceeding; and defining "qualified building inspector or enforcement officer" as persons nationally accredited and certified by the International Code Council or the National Fire Protection Association.
Title
Municipalities - Municipal Infraction Proceedings - Designation of a Building Inspector or an Enforcement Officer to Testify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {990919/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Attorneys
Building Codes
Disabilities
Fire Protection
Housing
Inspections
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Witnesses
Building Codes
Disabilities
Fire Protection
Housing
Inspections
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Witnesses