MD HB516 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct an audit of the Baltimore Police Department to evaluate the effectiveness and efficiency of the financial management practices of the Department beginning July 1, 2020, and at least once every 6 years thereafter; and requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to provide information regarding the audit process to the Baltimore Police Department.
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {414167/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Communications
Disclosure
Examinations
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Communications
Disclosure
Examinations
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials