MD HB518 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Baltimore County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings engaged in agritourism from a permit requirement; providing for the number of people allowed to occupy a building engaged in agritourism in Baltimore County under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {120116/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |