MD HB518 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a publisher who offers to license an electronic literary product to the public to also offer to license the product to public libraries in the State on reasonable terms that would enable public libraries to provide library users with access to the electronic literary product; authorizing the terms of a license authorizing public libraries to provide access to electronic literary products to include certain limitations; defining an electronic literary product; etc.
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411 |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994539/1 Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {405764/1 Adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB432 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Subjects
Contracts
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Licenses
Mobile Devices
Recordings
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Weights and Measures
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Licenses
Mobile Devices
Recordings
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 23 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |