MD HB520 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include $100,000 in the annual budget beginning in fiscal year 2021 for the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund; establishing the Task Force on Maryland Maternal and Child Health; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations, including programs that the Maryland Medical Assistance Program should implement; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {297770/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {566985/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0520&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0520f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0520t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0520e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_661_hb0520e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0520_56698501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0520_29777001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0520.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0520_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0520_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0637.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0520_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1328.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback