MD HB522 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain regulations adopted by the Maryland Department of Health establishing a certain licensing system is a rescindable, rather than nonrescindable, alternative to certain regulation; extending, from 14 to 30, the number of consecutive days of operation authorized under a license to operate a temporary food service facility before the license expires; authorizing the Department to adopt certain regulations governing excluded organizations; requiring an excluded organization to meet certain requirements; etc.
Title
Public Health - Food Establishments - Licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {326486/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Diseases
Fire Protection
Food
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Religion
Restaurants
Safety
Time
Veterans
Volunteers
Fire Protection
Food
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Religion
Restaurants
Safety
Time
Veterans
Volunteers