MD HB522 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB327
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specialized curriculum for school resource officers and school security employees to include training in certain matters; requiring that beginning on September 1, 2021, a school resource office or school security employee meet certain qualifications; requiring the Maryland Center for School Safety to develop a specialized curriculum and offer training to certain supervisors and administrators; requiring a local school system that employs a security employee to establish a certain complaint process; etc.
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-42) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {675865/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB327 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appropriations
Arrests
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Criminal Background Investigations
Curriculum
Data
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Grants
Immigrants and Citizenship
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Managers and Supervisors
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Psychologists
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Social Workers
Students
Teachers
Appropriations
Arrests
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Criminal Background Investigations
Curriculum
Data
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Grants
Immigrants and Citizenship
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Managers and Supervisors
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Psychologists
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Social Workers
Students
Teachers