MD HB528 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring county boards of education to encourage the use of open space on public school property for the purpose of planting and maintaining gardens; and requiring each county board to adopt specified procedures; etc.
Title
Education - Open Space on Public School Property - Planting and Maintaining
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. William Frick [D] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (122-15) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading Ways and Means |