MD HB531 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring drivers approaching from the rear certain vehicles that are stopped, standing, or parked on a highway and using certain visual signals to make a lane change to an available lane not immediately adjacent to the stopped, standing, or parked vehicle under certain circumstances, or to slow to a reasonable and prudent speed that is safe for certain existing conditions under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] |
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed (41-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Towing
Traffic Regulation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Towing
Traffic Regulation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road