MD HB531 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a sentence for certain persons convicted of certain sexual abuse crimes to include a term of lifetime sexual offender supervision; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Sexual Offenders – Lifetime Supervision
Sponsors
Del. Matt Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-0) |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
SB333 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
SB333 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 723 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |