MD HB532 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a State contribution to a Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan may be made to one account for each qualified beneficiary; limiting a qualified beneficiary from receiving more than one State contribution for each year the beneficiary is eligible for the State contribution; and authorizing the Maryland 529 Board to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB615 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Referred Appropriations
Subjects
Appropriations
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investments
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investments
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 19A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-04.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |