MD HB539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to use reusable diverted water on the site on which it originates for purposes such as gardening, composting, lawn watering, and irrigation in accordance with certain requirements; and defining "reusable diverted water" to mean water that is generated by backwashing an on-site potable water treatment system or using an ice maker, is collected for reuse instead of discharged to a residential on-site sewage disposal system, and contains no constituents that are harmful to public health or environment.
Title
Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {400817/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Boundaries
Environment
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Plumbing
Recycling
Sewage
Toilets
Water
Boundaries
Environment
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Plumbing
Recycling
Sewage
Toilets
Water