MD HB543 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing certain requirements technology-based businesses must meet before the Maryland Technology Development Corporation may make certain grants or provide certain equity investment financing; requiring the Corporation to adopt certain regulations related to the investment committee; requiring the Board of Directors of the Corporation to make certain appointments; providing that certain persons are subject to certain public ethics law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {935361/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback