MD HB545 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $25,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Bowie Interfaith Pantry and Emergency Aid Fund, Inc. for the planning, design, construction, and renovation of the Bowie Interfaith Pantry, located in Bowie; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bowie Interfaith Pantry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn | |
2010-03-11 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/13 at 11:00 a.m. | |
2010-02-02 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0545.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0545f.pdf |