MD HB545 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from being in or on the motor vehicle of another with the intent to commit theft of property that is on the motor vehicle; establishing a penalty for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Crimes - Theft from a Motor Vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 392917/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judiciary |