MD HB549 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring, on or before December 31 each year, the Board to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the Board's disciplinary activities for the previous fiscal year.
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 249 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB394 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |