MD HB552 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the failure of law enforcement to notify a certain individual that the individual is being recorded does not affect the admissibility of a certain recording if the failure to notify involved an individual who joined a discussion in progress for which proper notification was previously given.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interception of Oral Communication - Law Enforcement Officer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-4) (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-35) (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (42-4)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (102-35)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {682011/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback