MD HB554 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a certain notice in a certain forfeiture proceeding to be prominently posted for 30 consecutive days on an official website of the county in which the action is pending as an alternative to publishing the notice in a certain newspaper.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {672215/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Judiciary |