MD HB555 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time that a local board of elections may begin opening absentee ballot envelopes to canvass the absentee ballots cast in an election to before 9 a.m. on the Friday following election day instead of prior to 8 a.m. on the Wednesday following election day; and prohibiting the use of a wireless wide area network to transmit data from certain electronic poll books to the State Board of Elections or the local boards of elections during an election that is held before January 1, 2021.
Title
Election Administration – Absentee Ballot Canvass and Moratorium on Use of Wireless Network
Sponsors
Del. Nick Mosby [D] | Del. Alice Cain [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {834535/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Floor Amendment {223526/1 (Delegate Mosby) Adopted |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Mosby) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Mosby) Adopted |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB362 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Ballots
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Examinations
internet
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Examinations
internet
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 11 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |