MD HB556 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that unit owners may vote to amend the bylaws of a condominium by an affirmative vote of at least 60% of unit owners in good standing, or by a lower percentage of unit owners in good standing if required in the bylaws; and clarifying the circumstances under which lot owners may vote to amend certain governing documents of a homeowners association.
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |