MD HB558 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the manner in which the holder of an entertainment facility license in Anne Arundel County may sell beer, wine, and liquor; altering the scope of certain entertainment that may be performed in the licensed premises; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to authorize the sale of alcoholic beverages in certain areas for a promotional event in an area adjacent to the entertainment facility; authorizing the Board to revoke a certain license after a finding that a certain activity has occurred; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {373497/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB126 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Special Events
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Special Events
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 2104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |