MD HB560 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to October 1, 2013, the date by which an individual is required to be licensed by the State Board of Physicians before the individual may practice polysomnography in the State; extending to September 30, 2013, the date before which the Board is required to waive a specified education requirement for specified individuals; etc.
Title
Polysomnography - Technologists Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-08 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Examinations
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Reports
Substance Abuse
Education
Examinations
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Reports
Substance Abuse