MD HB560 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring individuals applying for or receiving temporary cash assistance benefits under the Family Investment Program to comply with eligibility requirements related to drug testing; authorizing temporary cash assistance benefits that have been terminated to resume under specified circumstances; requiring an addictions specialist to notify the Family Investment Program case manager if an applicant or a recipient does not complete drug testing; etc.
Title
Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn | |
2012-02-21 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Chemical Tests
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Notices
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Welfare
Chemical Tests
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Notices
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Welfare
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0560.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0560f.pdf |