MD HB560 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the policy of the State on public-private partnerships; authorizing a reporting agency to establish a public-private partnership and execute an agreement in connection with specified functions, services, or assets; requiring a reporting agency to adopt regulations and establish processes for the development, solicitation, evaluation, award, and delivery of public-private partnerships; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public-Private Partnerships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-18) (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Stone) {333829/1 Rejected (12-35) (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-19) (Y: 119 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {623526/1 Rejected (44-93) (Y: 44 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-09HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5
2013-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2013-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (117-18)
2013-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2013-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
2013-04-04SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Stone) {333829/1 Rejected (12-35)
2013-04-04SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Peters) Adopted
2013-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {379036/1 Report Adopted
2013-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2013-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-11SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2013-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (119-19)
2013-03-08HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
2013-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-06HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {623526/1 Rejected (44-93)
2013-03-06HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {863323/1 Adopted
2013-03-05HouseSpecial Order until 3/6 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2013-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {980215/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2013-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
2013-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters and Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0560&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0560f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0560t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0560e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_5_hb0560e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0560_98021501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0560_62352601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0560_86332301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0560_37903601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0560_33382901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0560.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0560_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0560_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0560_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0560,h-0210&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0560,h-0258&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0560,s-1037&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0560,s-1038&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0560,h-1134&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback