MD HB562 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a contract for the sale of residential real property in Montgomery County to contain a provision that provides notice of the Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit available through the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency's website, including an internet address that links to the Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit; requiring a certain contract to be independently initialed by the purchaser; providing that the failure of the vendor to include or the purchaser to initial certain contract provisions my not void the contract; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {150716/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Education
Environment
Federal Government
internet
Montgomery County
Notices
Public Information
Real Estate
Real Property
Sewage
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Education
Environment
Federal Government
internet
Montgomery County
Notices
Public Information
Real Estate
Real Property
Sewage