MD HB563 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain obsolete provisions of law relating to certain gaming activities and benefit performances in Montgomery County; and repealing a certain obsolete provision of law relating to certain benefit performances in Montgomery County.
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169 |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {445760/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Fairs
Gaming
Lottery
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Fairs
Gaming
Lottery
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations