MD HB570 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a behavioral health program licensed as an outpatient mental health center to satisfy any regulatory requirement that a medical director be on-site through the use of telehealth by the director.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFloor Amendment {413929/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {596783/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0570&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0570f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0570t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0570e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_274_hb0570e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0570_59678301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0570_41392901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0570.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0570_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0308.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0570_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1329.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback