MD HB575 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the provision of law prohibiting in Carroll County the issuance of a permit authorizing the operation of a gaming event after 1 a.m. on Sunday.
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {385568/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |