MD HB578 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain volunteer first responders to enroll and participate as covered employees in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; defining "volunteer first responder" as a person engaged in providing emergency medical care or rescue services on a volunteer basis; and authorizing the State to charge a county or municipal corporation certain costs resulting from certain covered employees participating in the Program.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - Volunteer First Responders
Sponsors
Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Bob Long [R] |
Del. Nino Mangione [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Health Insurance
Law Enforcement
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Medical Treatments
Municipal Corporations
Prices
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Volunteers
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Health Insurance
Law Enforcement
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Medical Treatments
Municipal Corporations
Prices
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 513.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |